Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Chbeir

Bishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1961 BornGhosta
13 Jun 198827.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 201554.1AppointedBishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Maronite), Syria
18 Apr 201554.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Maronite), Syria

MicroData Summary for Antoine Chbeir:
Bishop Antoine Chbeir (born ) Bishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea}

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 30 Mar 2015
  • c34: CB, 18 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,478

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 8 Dec 2015