Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Antonio Pierre Arida

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1863Born
28 Sep 189027.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 190844.8SelectedBishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)
18 Jun 190844.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)
28 Jun 190844.9InstalledBishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)
8 Jan 193268.4SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
13 Mar 193369.6ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
19 May 195591.7DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Antonio Pierre Arida
Patriarch Antonio Pierre Arida (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBscharré

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 46.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast