Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abdallah Elias Zaidan, M.L.

Bishop of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles (Maronite), California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1963 BornQusayba - Metn
26 Sep 198421.5Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Congregation of the Lebanese Maronite Missionaries (Maronite)
20 Jul 198623.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Lebanese Maronite Missionaries (Maronite)
10 Jul 201350.3AppointedBishop of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles (Maronite), California, USA
28 Sep 201350.5Ordained BishopBishop of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles (Maronite), California, USA

MicroData Summary for Abdallah Elias Zaidan:
Bishop Abdallah Elias Zaidan M.L. (born ) Bishop of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2013
  • ob: CB, 10 Jul 2013
  • c2+: CB, 10 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,883
  • c1: CB, 20 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 22 Jun 2015