Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guy-Paul Noujaim

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite)

Titular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1935 BornKfartay
11 Jun 196731.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jun 199054.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite), Lebanon
9 Jun 199054.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
12 Aug 199055.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
16 Jun 201276.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Guy-Paul Noujaim:
Bishop Guy-Paul Noujaim (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,380
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014