Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Emile Mouawad

Bishop of Zahleh (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1970 Born
13 Aug 199525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Jbeil {Byblos} (Maronite), Lebanon
16 Jun 201242.2ConfirmedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
16 Jun 201242.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia dei Maroniti
28 Jul 201242.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia dei Maroniti
14 Mar 201544.9AppointedBishop of Zahleh (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Joseph Emile Mouawad
Bishop Joseph Emile Mouawad (born ) Bishop of Zahleh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMayfouq
Ordained BishopBkerké

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Zahleh (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,519
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Mar 2015
  • c2+: CB, 9 Apr 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,752

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast