Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elias Khoury Sleman

Bishop Emeritus of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Maronite), Syria

Note/Previous Titular See: (Presidente del Tribunale Patriarcale di Appello)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1951 Born
29 Aug 198736.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Maronite), Syria
5 Jun 201159.8SelectedBishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Maronite), Syria
16 Jan 201260.4ConfirmedBishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Maronite), Syria
25 Feb 201260.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Maronite), Syria
26 Feb 201260.5InstalledBishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Maronite), Syria
14 Mar 201563.5ResignedBishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Maronite), Syria

MicroData Summary for Elias Khoury Sleman
Bishop Elias Khoury Sleman (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lattaquié {Laodicea}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHekr Semaan

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Jan 2012
  • c34/i: CB, 25 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,269
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast