Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Joseph VI Estephan

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1729¹BornGhosta, Lebanon
21 May 175223.3Ordained PriestPriest
1754¹25.0AppointedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon
Aug 1754³25.5Ordained BishopBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon
1762²33.0ResignedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon
9 Jun 176637.4SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
6 Apr 176738.2ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
22 Apr 179364.3DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph VI Estephan
Patriarch Joseph VI Estephan (born 1729, died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,587
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016