Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Youssef Anis Abi-Aad, Ist. del Prado †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1940Born
18 Jun 196626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Istituto del Prado
7 Jun 199757.4AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
1 Nov 199757.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
11 Nov 201373.8ResignedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
6 May 201777.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria

MicroData Summary for Youssef Anis Abi-Aad
Archbishop Youssef Anis Abi-Aad Ist. del Prado (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDfoun
Death PlaceLebanon

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,166
  • r: CB, 21 Apr 2015
  • d: CB, 6 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017