Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Peter Karam

Curial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Titular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia dei Maroniti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1959 Born
2 Jan 198828.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite), New York, USA
19 Feb 199434.4IncardinatedPriest of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles (Maronite), California, USA
15 Jun 201959.7AppointedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
15 Jun 201959.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia dei Maroniti
31 Jul 201959.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia dei Maroniti

MicroData Summary for Peter Karam
Father Peter Karam (born ) Curial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeirut, Archeparchy of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite)
Ordained BishopBkerke

Please contact the Father through the Patriarchate of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2019
  • opd/inca: CB, 15 Jun 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 6 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 7 Jul 2019

Quantcast