Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre-Paul Cardinal Méouchi

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1894Born
7 Dec 191723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
29 Apr 193440.0AppointedBishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
8 Dec 193440.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
25 May 195561.1AppointedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
22 Feb 196570.8Elevated to Cardinal
11 Jan 197580.7DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Paul Méouchi
Pierre-Paul Cardinal Méouchi (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDjezzine

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
  • a cardinal for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017