Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mounir Khairallah

Bishop of Batrun (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1953 BornMtah-Ezziat
13 Sep 197724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Batrun (Maronite), Lebanon
5 Jun 201158.4SelectedBishop of Batrun (Maronite), Lebanon
16 Jan 201259.0ConfirmedBishop of Batrun (Maronite), Lebanon
25 Feb 201259.1Ordained BishopBishop of Batrun (Maronite), Lebanon
26 Feb 201259.1InstalledBishop of Batrun (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Mounir Khairallah:
Bishop Mounir Khairallah (born ) Bishop of Batrun

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Batrun (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Jan 2012
  • c34/i: CB, 25 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 9 Oct 2013