Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Aoukar, O.A.M.

Curial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Titular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia dei Maroniti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1964 Born
12 Aug 199025.6ProfessedMember of Antonin Maronite Order (Maronite)
12 Jun 199530.4Perpetual VowsMember of Antonin Maronite Order (Maronite)
10 Aug 199631.6Ordained PriestPriest of Antonin Maronite Order (Maronite)
15 Jun 201954.4AppointedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
15 Jun 201954.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia dei Maroniti
31 Jul 201954.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia dei Maroniti

MicroData Summary for Antoine Aoukar
Bishop Antoine Aoukar O.A.M. (born ) Curial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMreiji, Archeparchy of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite)
Ordained BishopPatriarchal, Church, Bkerke

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchate of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 6 Jul 2019
  • c34: CB, 31 Jul 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast