Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hanna G. Alwan, M.L.

Curial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)

Titular Bishop of Sarepta dei Maroniti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1954 BornAytou, Lebanon
197924.3Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Congregation of the Lebanese Maronite Missionaries (Maronite)
18 Jul 198126.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Lebanese Maronite Missionaries (Maronite)
6 Jun 201156.7SelectedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
13 Aug 201156.9ConfirmedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
13 Aug 201156.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta dei Maroniti
16 Sep 201157.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta dei Maroniti

MicroData Summary for Hanna G. Alwan:
Bishop Hanna G. Alwan M.L. (born ) Curial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch}

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchate of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 25 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,143
  • c4: CB, 9 Oct 2011
  • elec: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2012, Page 962

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013