Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Chihane

Bishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1953 BornHaret Sakhr
12 Aug 197926.2Ordained PriestPriest of Jounieh (Maronite), Lebanon
16 Jun 201259.0ConfirmedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite), Egypt
28 Jul 201259.2Ordained BishopBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Georges Chihane:
Bishop Georges Chihane (born ) Bishop of Le Caire {Cairo}

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,516

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013