Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Youhanna Rafic Warcha

Curial Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Titular Bishop of Apamea in Syria dei Maroniti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1971 Born
17 Aug 199624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Jounieh (Maronite), Lebanon
14 Feb 201846.3AppointedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
14 Feb 201846.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Apamea in Syria dei Maroniti
7 Apr 201846.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apamea in Syria dei Maroniti
15 Jun 2019³47.6ResignedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Youhanna Rafic Warcha
Bishop Youhanna Rafic Warcha (born ) Curial Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOkaibé, Eparchy of Jounieh (Maronite)
Ordained BishopNotre Dame du Liban, Basilica, Harissa, Patriarchate of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchate of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2018
  • ob/c12: CB, 14 Feb 2018
  • mb/c34: CB, 7 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,757
  • r: CB, 15 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast