Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Abi-Saber, O.L.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite), Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1923Born
16 Jul 195229.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Lebanese Maronite (Maronite)
4 Aug 197754.2AppointedBishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Maronite), Syria
12 Nov 197754.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Maronite), Syria
2 May 198662.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
2 May 198662.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Aradus
23 Nov 199067.5AppointedBishop of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite), Canada
7 Feb 199672.7ResignedBishop of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite), Canada
26 Aug 201592.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite), Canada

MicroData Summary for Georges Abi-Saber (VIAF: 27074564)
Bishop Georges Abi-Saber O.L.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Maron de Montréal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWadi Sette

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • d: CB, 3 Sep 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast