Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Jacob IV Awad

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)


Events

DateEventTitle
1698²Ordained BishopBishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)
6 Nov 1705SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
21 Feb 1706ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
12 Feb 1733DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacob IV Awad:
Patriarch Jacob IV Awad (died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013