Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Youssef Boutros Hobaish (Habaisci)

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1787BornSahel Aalma
26 Jun 181427.1Ordained PriestPriest
1820¹32.6AppointedBishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)
30 Jan 182032.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)
25 May 182336.0SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
3 May 182437.0ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
23 May 184558.0DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Youssef Boutros Hobaish (Habaisci)
Patriarch Youssef Boutros Hobaish (Habaisci) (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,926
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 79
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,590
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1809, Number 18
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Nov 2016