Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Marwan Tabet, M.L.

Bishop of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1961 BornBhamdoun, Lebanon
20 Jul 198625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Lebanese Maronite Missionaries (Maronite)
Jun 2012³50.9SelectedBishop of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite), Canada
10 Jan 201351.5ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite), Canada
26 Jan 201351.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite), Canada
24 Feb 201351.6InstalledBishop of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite), Canada

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul-Marwan Tabet:
Bishop Paul-Marwan Tabet M.L. (born ) Bishop of Saint-Maron de Montréal

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jan 2013
  • ob: CB, 10 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,650

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013