Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hanna Rahmé, O.L.M.

Bishop of Baalbek-Deir El-Ahmar (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1960 Born
6 Aug 198929.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of Lebanese Maronite (Maronite)
29 Jul 199030.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Lebanese Maronite (Maronite)
14 Mar 201554.6SelectedBishop of Baalbek-Deir El-Ahmar (Maronite), Lebanon
20 Jun 201554.9ConfirmedBishop of Baalbek-Deir El-Ahmar (Maronite), Lebanon
1 Aug 201555.0Ordained BishopBishop of Baalbek-Deir El-Ahmar (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Hanna Rahmé
Bishop Hanna Rahmé O.L.M. (born ) Bishop of Baalbek-Deir El-Ahmar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAynata

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Baalbek-Deir El-Ahmar (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 Jul 2015
  • c3: CB, 1 Aug 2015
  • c4: CB, 2 Aug 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,555

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast