Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Chucrallah Harb

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jounieh (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1923Born
19 Jun 194926.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 196743.8AppointedBishop of Baalbek (Maronite), Lebanon
14 May 196744.0Ordained BishopBishop of Baalbek (Maronite), Lebanon
4 Aug 197754.2AppointedBishop of Jounieh (Maronite), Lebanon
5 Jun 199976.0RetiredBishop of Jounieh (Maronite), Lebanon
31 Dec 201996.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Jounieh (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary
Chucrallah Harb
Bishop Chucrallah Harb
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Jounieh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTannourine

  • a priest for 70.5 years
  • a bishop for 52.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • r: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 2 Jan 2020
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025