Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Eduardo Henríquez Jiménez

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Valencia en Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1913BornValencia
27 Mar 193723.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 196248.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
12 May 196248.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamdia
17 Jun 196248.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamdia
9 Nov 197259.2AppointedBishop of Valencia en Venezuela
12 Nov 197461.2AppointedArchbishop of Valencia en Venezuela
16 Mar 199076.6RetiredArchbishop of Valencia en Venezuela
8 Aug 199178.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Valencia en Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Luis Eduardo Henríquez Jiménez:
Archbishop Luis Eduardo Henríquez Jiménez (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Valencia en Venezuela

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 80
  • ab/v100: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 64, Page 737

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015