Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Centoz

Deceased

Vice-Chamberlain of the Apostolic Chamber

Titular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1883Born
9 Jun 190623.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 193248.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
28 Jan 193248.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bolivia
14 Feb 193248.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
14 Sep 193653.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venezuela
12 Feb 194056.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lithuania
13 Aug 194057.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Lithuania
3 Dec 194158.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nicaragua
3 Dec 194158.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Panama
3 Dec 194158.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Costa Rica
4 Oct 194865.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Nicaragua
26 Apr 195269.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Panama
26 Apr 195269.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Costa Rica
29 Nov 195471.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Puerto Rico
29 Nov 195471.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cuba
1960¹76.7ResignedApostolic Delegate to Puerto Rico
5 Jul 196279.2AppointedVice-Chamberlain of the Apostolic Chamber
28 Oct 196986.5DiedVice-Chamberlain of the Apostolic Chamber

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Centoz
Archbishop Luigi Centoz (born , died ) Vice-Chamberlain of Apostolic Chamber

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pietro, Diocese of Aosta, Italy

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab/vcha: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 54, Page 602
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1932, Number 7
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 72, and Page 105, and Page 106
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 108, and Page 168, and Page 181
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 194, and Page 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast