Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ramón Ovidio Pérez Morales

Bishop Emeritus of Los Teques


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1932 BornPregonero
26 Oct 195826.3Ordained PriestPriest of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
2 Dec 197038.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
2 Dec 197038.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Byzacena
19 Mar 197138.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Byzacena
20 May 198047.9AppointedBishop of Coro, Venezuela
23 Dec 199260.5AppointedArchbishop of Maracaibo, Venezuela
5 Jun 199966.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Los Teques, Venezuela
30 Dec 200472.5ResignedBishop of Los Teques, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Ramón Ovidio Pérez Morales:
Archbishop Ramón Ovidio Pérez Morales (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Los Teques

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Los Teques.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 16 Dec 2013