Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfredo José Rodríguez Figueroa

Deceased

Archbishop of Cumaná


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1933BornValencia
22 Dec 195725.0Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia en Venezuela
24 Jul 197441.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
24 Jul 197441.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lari Castellum
8 Sep 197441.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lari Castellum
12 Mar 198754.2AppointedBishop of Cumaná, Venezuela
13 May 198754.4InstalledBishop of Cumaná, Venezuela
16 May 199259.4AppointedArchbishop of Cumaná, Venezuela
17 Sep 200168.7DiedArchbishop of Cumaná, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Alfredo José Rodríguez Figueroa:
Archbishop Alfredo José Rodríguez Figueroa (born , died ) Archbishop of Cumaná

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Apr 2014