Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Feliciano González Ascanio

Deceased

Bishop of Maracay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1921BornGuatire
24 Oct 194322.6Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jul 196241.4AppointedBishop of Maracay, Venezuela
2 Sep 196241.5Ordained BishopBishop of Maracay, Venezuela
13 Dec 198665.7DiedBishop of Maracay, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Feliciano González Ascanio:
Bishop Feliciano González Ascanio (born , died ) Bishop of Maracay

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013