Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Misuraca

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Venezuela

Titular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1884Born
18 Apr 190824.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 194157.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
2 Jul 194157.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venezuela
20 Jul 194157.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
Mar 1949³65.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venezuela
4 Jun 196278.2DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Venezuela

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Misuraca (VIAF: 88891841)
Archbishop Giuseppe Misuraca (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Venezuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCefalù, Diocese of Cefalù, Italy

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 43
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast