Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Rosalio José Cardinal Castillo Lara, S.D.B. †

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State

Cardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora di Coromoto in San Giovanni di Dio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1922BornSan Casimiro
4 Sep 194927.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
26 Mar 197350.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Praecausa
26 Mar 197350.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Trujillo, Venezuela
24 May 197350.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Praecausa
12 Feb 197552.4AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Canon Law
5 Oct 198159.1AppointedPresident of the Roman Curia - Other
22 May 198259.7AppointedPro-President of the Pontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Canon Law
26 May 198259.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Praecausa
18 Jan 198461.4AppointedPro-President of the Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law
25 May 198562.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Nostra Signora di Coromoto in San Giovanni di Dio
25 May 198562.7Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 198562.7AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law
6 Dec 198967.3AppointedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
31 Oct 199068.2AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
24 Jun 199572.8ResignedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
29 Jan 199673.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora di Coromoto in San Giovanni di Dio
14 Oct 199775.1ResignedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
16 Oct 200785.1DiedPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State

MicroData Summary for Rosalio José Castillo Lara:
Rosalio José Cardinal Castillo Lara S.D.B. (born , died ) President Emeritus of Vatican City State

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
  • a cardinal for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 16 Feb 2014