Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miguel Antonio Salas Salas, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mérida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1915BornLa Grita
24 Mar 194327.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
16 Jan 196145.3AppointedBishop of Calabozo, Venezuela
2 Feb 196145.3Ordained BishopBishop of Calabozo, Venezuela
20 Aug 197963.9AppointedArchbishop of Mérida, Venezuela
30 Oct 199176.1RetiredArchbishop of Mérida, Venezuela
30 Oct 200388.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mérida, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Miguel Antonio Salas Salas:
Archbishop Miguel Antonio Salas Salas C.I.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mérida

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 12 Jun 2014