Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Rafael Pulido Méndez

Deceased

Archbishop of Mérida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1907BornTovár
10 Aug 193022.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 195850.7AppointedBishop of Maracaibo, Venezuela
19 Oct 195851.0Ordained BishopBishop of Maracaibo, Venezuela
16 Jan 196153.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mérida, Venezuela
16 Jan 196153.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
22 Nov 196659.1SucceededArchbishop of Mérida, Venezuela
15 Dec 196659.1InstalledArchbishop of Mérida, Venezuela
30 Aug 197264.8DiedArchbishop of Mérida, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for José Rafael Pulido Méndez:
Archbishop José Rafael Pulido Méndez (born , died ) Archbishop of Mérida

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013