Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Constantino Maradei Donato

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Barcelona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1915BornCiudad Bolívar
8 Apr 193923.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 196549.6AppointedBishop of Cabimas, Venezuela
29 Aug 196549.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cabimas, Venezuela
18 Nov 196953.9AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Venezuela
16 Nov 199175.9RetiredBishop of Barcelona, Venezuela
9 Jan 199276.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Barcelona, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Constantino Maradei Donato:
Bishop Constantino Maradei Donato (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Barcelona

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 20 Jan 2014