Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Maria Pellin

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Titular Bishop of Aquae Thibilitanae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1892BornCaracas
25 May 191825.5Ordained PriestPriest of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
13 Jul 196572.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
13 Jul 196572.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Thibilitanae
29 Aug 196572.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Thibilitanae
19 Nov 196977.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Jesús Maria Pellin:
Bishop Jesús Maria Pellin (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015