Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Delgado Avila, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Barcelona, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1929Born
17 Dec 195526.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
13 Jul 197950.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
13 Jul 197950.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Scebatiana
11 Sep 197950.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scebatiana
16 Nov 199162.4AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Venezuela
21 Jun 199768.0ResignedBishop of Barcelona, Venezuela
18 Nov 200879.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Barcelona, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Miguel Delgado Avila
Bishop Miguel Delgado Avila S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Ordained BishopSt. Jean Bosco, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,428

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast