Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Aimé-Anatole Prunier, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Salem, India

Titular Bishop of Tanagra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1889Born
7 Mar 191425.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
26 May 193041.2AppointedBishop of Salem, India
14 Sep 193041.5Ordained BishopBishop of Salem, India
20 Nov 194758.7ResignedBishop of Salem, India
20 Nov 194758.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanagra
10 Mar 195768.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Salem, India

MicroData Summary for Henri-Aimé-Anatole Prunier
Bishop Henri-Aimé-Anatole Prunier M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Salem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Sever, France

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast