Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Regno, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kandy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1886BornFabriano
18 Dec 190923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
27 Jan 193649.4AppointedBishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka
29 Mar 193649.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka
24 Sep 195872.1ResignedBishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka
24 Sep 195872.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bagai
26 Jan 197184.4ResignedTitular Bishop of Bagai
22 Aug 197791.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Kandy, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Regno:
Bishop Bernardo Regno O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kandy

  • a priest for 67.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: Website of the Diocese, 19 Aug 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 26 Dec 2013