Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Antonio Peteiro Freire, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tanger, Morocco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1936Born
17 Mar 196225.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 Jul 198346.9AppointedArchbishop of Tanger, Morocco
24 Sep 198347.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tanger, Morocco
23 Mar 200568.6ResignedArchbishop of Tanger, Morocco
24 Mar 201073.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tanger, Morocco

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Peteiro Freire
Archbishop José Antonio Peteiro Freire O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tanger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilasantar, Spain

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Feb 2017