Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Léon-Etienne Cardinal Duval

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Alger

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1903BornChênex, France
18 Dec 192623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Annecy, France
8 Nov 194643.0AppointedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
11 Feb 194743.3Ordained BishopBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
3 Feb 195450.2AppointedArchbishop of Alger, Algeria
22 Feb 196561.3Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 196561.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
19 Apr 198884.4RetiredArchbishop of Alger, Algeria
30 May 199692.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Alger, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Léon-Etienne Duval:
Cardinal Léon-Etienne Duval (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Alger

  • a priest for 69.4 years
  • a bishop for 49.3 years
  • a cardinal for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013