Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Edward Kearney

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rochester, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1884BornRed Oak, IA
19 Sep 190823.8Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 193247.6AppointedBishop of Salt Lake, Utah, USA
28 Oct 193248.0Ordained BishopBishop of Salt Lake, Utah, USA
31 Jul 193752.7AppointedBishop of Rochester, New York, USA
21 Oct 196681.9RetiredBishop of Rochester, New York, USA
21 Oct 196681.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabaicara
18 Jan 197186.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Tabaicara
12 Jan 197792.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Rochester, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for James Edward Kearney:
Bishop James Edward Kearney (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rochester

  • a priest for 68.3 years
  • a bishop for 44.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015