Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Annibale Cardinal Albani

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1682Born
23 Dec 171129.3Elevated to Cardinal
4 Jan 171229.3AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
2 Mar 171229.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
18 Sep 171230.0Ordained DeaconCardinal-Deacon
8 Jun 171633.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
29 Mar 171936.6AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
6 Jul 172239.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
28 Oct 172240.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 173047.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
15 Aug 173048.0Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
9 Sep 174361.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
23 Feb 174764.5ResignedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
21 Oct 175169.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

MicroData Summary for Annibale Albani (VIAF: 61780940)
Annibale Cardinal Albani (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrbino, Italy

  • a priest for 28.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
  • a cardinal for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1711
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,730, Number 16
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 336, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 453, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 476, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 563, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 622, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 849, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,017, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast