Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Duane Garrison Hunt

Deceased

Bishop of Salt Lake City, Utah, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1884Born
191328.2Converted
27 Jun 192035.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salt Lake, Utah, USA
6 Aug 193752.8AppointedBishop of Salt Lake, Utah, USA
28 Oct 193753.1Ordained BishopBishop of Salt Lake, Utah, USA
31 Mar 196075.5DiedBishop of Salt Lake City, Utah, USA

MicroData Summary for Duane Garrison Hunt (VIAF: 39271603)
Bishop Duane Garrison Hunt (born , died ) Bishop of Salt Lake City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReynolds, NE
Ordained PriestMadeleine, Cathedral, Salt Lake City, Diocese of Salt Lake, Utah
Ordained BishopMadeleine, Cathedral, Salt Lake City, Diocese of Salt Lake, Utah

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 3 Oct 2018

Quantcast