Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Barberini (Jr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1662Born
13 Nov 169028.0Elevated to Cardinal
27 Nov 169028.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
26 Sep 170037.8Ordained DeaconCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
6 May 171552.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
15 Sep 171552.8Ordained PriestCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
11 May 171855.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
3 Mar 172158.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
16 Mar 172158.3Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
1 Jul 172663.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
17 Aug 173875.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

MicroData Summary for Francesco Barberini (Jr.) (VIAF: 27058794)
Francesco Cardinal Barberini (Jr.) (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 22.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
  • a cardinal for 47.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Nov 1690
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,721, Number 8
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 336, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 453, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 476, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 563, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 622, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 849, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,017, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast