Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Joseph Topel

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Spokane, Washington, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1903Born
7 Jun 192724.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 195552.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Spokane, Washington, USA
9 Aug 195552.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Binda
21 Sep 195552.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Binda
25 Sep 195552.4SucceededBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA
11 Apr 197875.0RetiredBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA
22 Oct 198683.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Spokane, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Bernard Joseph Topel
Bishop Bernard Joseph Topel (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Spokane

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBozeman, MT

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 23 Jul 2018

Quantcast