Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert Joseph Dwyer

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Portland in Oregon, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1908Born
11 Jun 193223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salt Lake City, Utah, USA
19 May 195243.7AppointedBishop of Reno, Nevada, USA
5 Aug 195244.0Ordained BishopBishop of Reno, Nevada, USA
9 Dec 196658.3AppointedArchbishop of Portland in Oregon, USA
6 Feb 196758.5InstalledArchbishop of Portland in Oregon, USA
15 Jan 197465.4ResignedArchbishop of Portland in Oregon, USA
24 Mar 197667.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Portland in Oregon, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Joseph Dwyer
Archbishop Robert Joseph Dwyer (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Portland in Oregon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalt Lake City

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018