Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Louis Whelan, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fairbanks, Alaska


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1912BornWallace, ID
17 Jun 194432.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
6 Dec 196755.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
6 Dec 196755.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sicilibba
22 Feb 196855.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sicilibba
15 Nov 196856.6SucceededBishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
13 Feb 196956.8InstalledBishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
1 Jun 198573.1RetiredBishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
15 Sep 200189.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Louis Whelan:
Bishop Robert Louis Whelan S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fairbanks

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013