Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-Louis Anne Madelain Cardinal Lefebvre de Cheverus

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1768BornMayenne, France
18 Dec 179022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Montauban, France
8 Apr 180840.2AppointedBishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
1 Nov 181042.8Ordained BishopBishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
12 Feb 182355.0SelectedBishop of Montauban, France
3 May 182355.3ConfirmedBishop of Montauban, France
13 Aug 182658.5SelectedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
2 Oct 182658.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
1 Feb 183668.0Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jul 183668.5DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis Anne Madelain Lefebvre de Cheverus:
Cardinal Jean-Louis Anne Madelain Lefebvre de Cheverus (born , died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
  • a cardinal for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 115, and Page 121
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 269

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013