Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Dunn

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of New York, New York

Titular Bishop of Camuliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1869BornNew York
30 May 189626.7Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
19 Aug 192151.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
19 Aug 192151.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Camuliana
28 Oct 192152.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Camuliana
31 Aug 193363.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Dunn:
Bishop John Joseph Dunn (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of New York

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015