Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Federico Marcello Cardinal Lante Montefeltro Della Rovere

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1695Born
21 Dec 172833.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Dec 172833.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 173237.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
19 Oct 173237.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
9 Sep 174348.3Elevated to Cardinal
5 Apr 174549.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
9 Apr 175357.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
13 Jul 175964.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
18 Jul 176368.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
3 Mar 177377.8DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

MicroData Summary for Federico Marcello Lante Montefeltro Della Rovere
Federico Marcello Cardinal Lante Montefeltro Della Rovere (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.3 years
  • a cardinal for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,411
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,732, Number 35
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 336, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 453, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 476, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 563, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 622, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 849, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,017, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast