Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Joseph Curley

Deceased

Bishop of Syracuse, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1869Born
19 May 189424.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Feb 192353.6AppointedBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
1 May 192353.8Ordained BishopBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
3 Aug 193263.1DiedBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel Joseph Curley
Bishop Daniel Joseph Curley (born , died ) Bishop of Syracuse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast