Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Maria Grasselli, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Viterbo e Tuscania

Titular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1827BornDolo Veneto
5 Jan 184821.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
22 Sep 184922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
14 Apr 187447.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Trapezopolis
17 May 187447.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trapezopolis
22 Dec 187448.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
19 Jun 189972.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
30 Dec 191387.0ResignedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
30 Dec 191387.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
1 Feb 191992.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Grasselli:
Archbishop Antonio Maria Grasselli O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Viterbo e Tuscania

  • a priest for 69.4 years
  • a bishop for 44.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1920
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,312
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 216, and Page 562
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 594
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013