Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Feruglio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vicenza, Italy

Titular Bishop of Amisus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1841Born
30 May 186322.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Sep 186322.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 189351.8AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
22 Jan 189351.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vicenza, Italy
4 Jan 191169.8ResignedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
4 Jan 191169.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Amisus
8 Feb 191169.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Vicenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Feruglio (VIAF: 264701430)
Bishop Antonio Feruglio (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vicenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFeletto-Umberto, Diocese of Udine
Ordained BishopS. Pantaleone, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 589
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 51
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1893, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017